U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-02769-
  • Case Name: CHRISTIAN SANCHEZ ORTEGA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Request for Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Notice to Debtors Form]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 7 or 11) - VAN Form]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.