U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:25-bk-02801-
  • Case Name: JEAN RUTH WINCH
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Deficiency/Warning Notc to Atty for No Declaration of Electronic Filing (Form)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Objection]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Objection]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Request for Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Summary of Schedules]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Initial Mailing List]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/34.00 Fee)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Amendment to Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J)]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [2Set Missing Filings Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Notice to Debtors Form]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.