U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02828-
  • Case Name: OSCAR SAUL ORTIZ-FIERRO
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Updated Address Notice (Undeliverable Mail)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Preparer]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Initial Mailing List]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee (New Case)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.