U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02822-PS
  • Case Name: BENJAMIN THOMAS CRAWFORD
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Initial Mailing List]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [oPay Filing Fee in Three Installments (Chapter 7 or 11) - VAN Form]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.