U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02856-
  • Case Name: TONIRENEE LASHELL ARNOLD
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.