U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-bk-08780-
  • Case Name: ARIN AMIRKHANI
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [oRelief from Stay]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.