U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-bk-09765-
  • Case Name: NATASHA WEAVER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Request to Set Claims Bar Date (batch)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Appointment of Trustee]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [oReopening Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order (batch)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Motion to Reopen Case (Reopen Fee Due)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Withdrawal of Report of No Distribution]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Close Bankruptcy Case (ALL)]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.