U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-01242-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Juan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial and Plea Deadline]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue Trial and Plea Deadline]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - FPD]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 09, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA 23]
  • April 04, 2025: [Brady v. Maryland - Tucson]
  • April 04, 2025: [Arraignment (Text Only)]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Initial Appearance (Text Only) - Tucson]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
  • April 04, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.