U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-01124
  • Case Name: Dukes v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
  • May 06, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b))]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
  • April 04, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • April 04, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 04, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.