U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-09135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Woodard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 13, 2025: [Magistrate Judge Findings & Recommendation]
  • May 13, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 13, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing (Text Only)]
  • May 13, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered (Guilty)]
  • May 13, 2025: [Consent of Defendant for Hearing Before a Magistrate Judge]
  • May 12, 2025: [Lodged Proposed Document]
  • May 05, 2025: [Set Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Change of Plea Hearing ]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Lodged Proposed Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial and Plea Deadline]
  • April 04, 2025: [Continue Trial and Plea Deadline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.