U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-01722-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tellez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order Adopting MJ Findings re Admissions/Pleas]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Magistrate Judge Findings & Recommendation]
  • May 07, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing (Text Only)]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered (Guilty)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Consent of Defendant for Hearing Before a Magistrate Judge]
  • May 05, 2025: [Lodged Proposed Document]
  • May 01, 2025: [Set Change of Plea Hearing ]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Arraignment (Text Only)]
  • April 25, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice re Passport]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 24, 2025: [Magistrate Judge Findings & Recommendation]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered (Guilty)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Review Detention Order ]
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Consent of Defendant for Hearing Before a Magistrate Judge]
  • April 22, 2025: [Review Detention Order ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Change of Plea Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.