U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-01147
  • Case Name: Redline Realty LLC v. Colony Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Dismiss Party]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 18, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 17, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 16, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
  • April 11, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • April 07, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.