U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00160
  • Case Name: Johncox v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • May 02, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 29, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 23, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 08, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • April 08, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.