U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01837
  • Case Name: HonorHealth v. Kennedy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Brief (Non Appeal)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Conference ]
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.