U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00394-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Keech et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Arraignment (Text Only)]
  • May 07, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Indictment/Information/Complaint (Sealed - Unredacted)]
  • May 01, 2025: [DOJ Conflict Memo]
  • May 01, 2025: [Indictment - Superseding]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extend Time ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.