U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00158
  • Case Name: Olding v. Pima County Prosecutor's Office et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • May 09, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 05, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Allow Electronic Filing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
  • April 08, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • April 08, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 08, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 08, 2025: [Allow Electronic Filing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 08, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 08, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.