U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-03064
  • Case Name: AMANDA R WALKER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Amendment to Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [oExtend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Schedules]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.