U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00541-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weinstein et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 12, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release ]
  • May 12, 2025: [Continue Trial ]
  • May 12, 2025: [Continue Trial and Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Association - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
  • May 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2025: [Continue Trial and Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 08, 2025: [Continue Trial ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Surrender/Return of Passport]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 01, 2025: [Initial Appearance (Text Only)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Arraignment (Text Only)]
  • May 01, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 28, 2025: [Surrender/Return of Passport]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
  • April 25, 2025: [Travel]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arraignment (Text Only)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance (Text Only)]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Brady Order - Phoenix]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Association - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Association - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2025: [Indictment/Information/Complaint (Sealed - Unredacted)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • April 09, 2025: [DOJ Conflict Memo]
  • April 09, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.