U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-01173
  • Case Name: Choudary v. Lyons
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set Motion Hearing ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Status Conference ]
  • April 11, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
  • April 10, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Issued as to USA ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • April 09, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • April 09, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 09, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.