U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-01176
  • Case Name: Greenberg Gross LLP v. GreenbergGrossLLP.com
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Service Unexecuted]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 15, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • April 14, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information]
  • April 11, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Initial Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information]
  • April 09, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • April 09, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.