U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02949
  • Case Name: Jolley v. Piedmont Airlines et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Dismiss Case]
  • April 22, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Errata]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 10, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 09, 2025: [Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.