U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00164--EJM
  • Case Name: Johnston v. Gutierrez
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Discovery]
  • May 02, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 25, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Assignment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.