U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00163
  • Case Name: Duke #060858 v. Thornell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Assignment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 09, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.