U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-03099
  • Case Name: DAVID SCOTT GUERIN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oExtend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (313.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.