U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-01802-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Soulat et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial and Plea Deadline]
  • May 12, 2025: [Continue Trial and Plea Deadline]
  • May 09, 2025: [Continue Trial and Plea Deadline]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Arraignment (Text Only)]
  • May 02, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Waiver of Defendants Presence at Arraignment and Acknowledgment of Trial Date]
  • April 28, 2025: [Waiver of Defendants Presence at Arraignment and Acknowledgment of Trial Date]
  • April 11, 2025: [Indictment/Information/Complaint (Sealed - Unredacted)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.