U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-01801-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castro-Galarza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Vacate Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [Set Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Arraignment (Text Only)]
  • May 02, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Indictment/Information/Complaint (Sealed - Unredacted)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.