U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-03105-
  • Case Name: ARCELIA C TIMA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [oReinstating Case]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Extend (Motion to)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Reinstate Case (Motion to)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Change of Address (Debtor)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Schedules]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [oDenying Motion to Reinstate (Form)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Reinstate Case (Motion to)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [2Set Missing Filings Deadlines]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [~Generic~ Entry of Meeting of Creditors Information]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Change Judge]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [DeBN Debtor Electronic Noticing Request]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Initial Mailing List]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [oPay Filing Fee in Three Installments (Chapter 7 or 11) - VAN Form]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [ID Requested, Identity Confirmed Filed by Non Debtor]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.