U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-01805-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moreno
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 30, 2025: [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Time Change Only - Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Detention/Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continue Detention/Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA 23]
  • April 22, 2025: [Brady v. Maryland - Tucson]
  • April 22, 2025: [Arraignment (Text Only)]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Initial Appearance (Text Only) - Tucson]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 11, 2025: [Indictment/Information/Complaint (Sealed - Unredacted)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Quash ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.