U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-01200
  • Case Name: Davis et al v. Tempe, City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 09, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 08, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 28, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 11, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 10, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 10, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • April 10, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • April 10, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.