U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00545-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lozano-Dominguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order Adopting MJ Findings and Recommendation]
  • May 08, 2025: [Magistrate Judge Findings & Recommendation]
  • May 08, 2025: [Lodged Plea Agreement]
  • May 08, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing (Text Only)]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered (Guilty)]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 22, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Conference (Text Only)]
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Set Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [DOJ Conflict Memo]
  • April 10, 2025: [Consent of Defendant for Hearing Before a Magistrate Judge]
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.