U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-03147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • May 06, 2025: [Memorandum]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [DOJ Conflict Memo]
  • April 29, 2025: [Information - Petty Offense (Class B)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Stipulation ]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Conference (Text Only)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Material Witness]
  • April 11, 2025: [Brady Order - Phoenix]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance (Text Only)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance (Text Only) - Tucson]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 10, 2025: [Affidavit for Detention of Material Witness]
  • April 10, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 10, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.