U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-50207-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Consent of Defendant for Hearing Before a Magistrate Judge]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - FPD]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 16, 2025: [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text Only)]
  • April 11, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.