U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-03112-
  • Case Name: CORNELIUS TANYI
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Request for Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice of Filing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Complaint]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Request for Notice]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Debtor Application to Waive Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 12 or 13) - VAN Form]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [4Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.