U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-mj-01955/A-MAA-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Melander
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2025: [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Stipulation ]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • April 24, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Brady v. Maryland - Tucson]
  • April 11, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA 23]
  • April 11, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance (Text Only) - Tucson]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Material Witness]
  • April 11, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Affidavit for Detention of Material Witness]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.