U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-01471-1
  • Case Name: USA v. James-Guzman et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 21, 2025: [Brady Order - Phoenix]
  • April 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance (Text Only)]
  • April 21, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 18, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance (Text Only)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 18, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Brady Order - Phoenix]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2025: [Brady Order - Phoenix]
  • April 14, 2025: [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance (Text Only)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 14, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.