U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-03191
  • Case Name: John Samuel Selden, IV
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [DeBN Debtor Electronic Noticing Request]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [2Set Missing Filings Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Voluntary Petition - Case Upload (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition - Case Upload (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.