U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-01720-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Galbraith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Pretrial Release Revocation Hearing (Text Only)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Petition to Revoke Probation/Release]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Location Start]
  • May 06, 2025: [Status Conference (Text Only)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Arraignment (Text Only)]
  • April 25, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Set Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Change of Plea Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.