U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-01221
  • Case Name: Hamerla v. PNC Bank
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • April 14, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • April 14, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.