U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00242-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diaz-Ceballos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment and Commitment Issued/Judgment of Probation Issued]
  • April 30, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing (Text Only)]
  • April 29, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 14, 2025: [Expedite ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.