U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00552-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ayala-Ayala
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Magistrate Judge Findings & Recommendation]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Lodged Plea Agreement]
  • April 30, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered (Guilty)]
  • April 30, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Set Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [DOJ Conflict Memo]
  • April 14, 2025: [Consent of Defendant for Hearing Before a Magistrate Judge]
  • April 14, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.