U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-03252-PS
  • Case Name: ERIC CHARLES FISHER and STEFFANIE SUE FISHER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.