U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-03255-
  • Case Name: BRYSON KYLE ECHOLS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [oDenying Application of the Debtor for Waiver of the Chapter 7 FF(Form) (338 fee)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [oDenying Application to Waive Filing Fee and to Pay Fee in Installments (Judge Order)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Initial Mailing List]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Debtor Application to Waive Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.