U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-01240
  • Case Name: Star Tech Solutions LLC v. EverDriven Technologies LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
  • April 29, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 18, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
  • April 15, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • April 15, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.