U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-08053
  • Case Name: Dave v. 2012 Bobby Shah Irrevocable Trust et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Withdraw]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
  • April 25, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.