U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-01238--MTM
  • Case Name: Tabatabaeifar v. Scott et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Motion Hearing ]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion ]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
  • April 29, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 28, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Issued as to USA ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 16, 2025: [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 15, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Assignment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Writ of Mandamus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.