U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-07574-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramirez-Mendoza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Judgment and Commitment Issued/Judgment of Probation Issued]
  • May 05, 2025: [Sentencing (Text Only)]
  • May 05, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Sentencing and/or Disposition Memorandum]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Response]
  • April 28, 2025: [Sentencing and/or Disposition Memorandum]
  • April 28, 2025: [Time Change Only - Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.