U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-08077--ESW
  • Case Name: Jarvis et al v. Mohave, County of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Supplement]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Vacate]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • April 30, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Disqualify Judge]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 16, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Assignment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
  • April 15, 2025: [Allow Electronic Filing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • April 15, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.