U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00542-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Carter et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial and Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 05, 2025: [Magistrate Judge Findings & Recommendation]
  • May 05, 2025: [Lodged Plea Agreement]
  • May 05, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing (Text Only)]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered (Guilty)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Consent of Defendant for Hearing Before a Magistrate Judge]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Set Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 30, 2025: [Transfer (LRCrim 5.2)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue Trial and Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 24, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice re Passport]
  • April 17, 2025: [Surrender/Return of Passport]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arraignment (Text Only)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance (Text Only)]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Brady Order - Phoenix]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 15, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 15, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA 23]
  • April 15, 2025: [Brady Order - Phoenix]
  • April 15, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 15, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.