U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-03290-
  • Case Name: WILLIAM R. SUKSI and CRYSTAL A SUKSI
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oReinstating Case]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Reinstatement (Notice of)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (313.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.