U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00174
  • Case Name: Arizona Student DOE #1 v. Trump et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Supplement ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Transcript Request]
  • April 17, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.